|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/11/1923 | 17/03/1924 | 137 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1925 | 20/10/1925 | 82 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1926 | 11/08/1926 | 140 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1926 | 17/09/1926 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1927 | 17/06/1927 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1928 | 15/11/1928 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1933 | 23/02/1934 | 124 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1935 | 06/12/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1937 | 19/11/1937 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1937 | 02/12/1937 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1937 | 21/12/1937 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1939 | 28/04/1939 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1940 | 22/08/1940 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1943 | 03/03/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1945 | 12/06/1945 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1947 | 14/06/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1947 | 30/06/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1949 | 04/01/1950 | 37 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69877 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24686 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1952 | 03/01/1953 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24730 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1957 | 23/01/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 11 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (West Hartlepool) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1531 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 17/03/1924. | ||
31/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1925. Dep: 20/10/1925. | ||
25/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1926. Dep: 11/08/1926. | ||
14/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
24/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1926. Dep: 17/09/1926. | ||
27/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 17/06/1927. | ||
17/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1928. Dep: 15/11/1928. | ||
23/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 23/10/1933. Dep: 23/02/1934. | ||
03/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
30/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/07/1935. | ||
23/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1935. Dep: 06/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
04/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1937. Dep: 19/11/1937. | ||
22/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 02/12/1937. | ||
10/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1937. Dep: 21/12/1937. | ||
23/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1939. Dep: 28/04/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
09/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1940. Dep: 22/08/1940. | ||
29/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A) |
||
18/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1945. Dep: 12/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 115 (Diagram 63A) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9877 | ||
13/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
24/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1947. Dep: 30/06/1947. | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
29/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 04/01/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3367 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69877 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
11/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24686 (Diagram 63B) |
||
15/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 03/01/1953. | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
21/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24730 (Diagram 63B) |
||
21/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1957. Dep: 23/01/1957. | ||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
12/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
30/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69877 from Scarborough (50E) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |