Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1499 m/e 06/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9878   14/07/1946
British Railways 69878   12/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H106/1921
A824/06/1936
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1921 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Fri 24/06/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 39 yrs , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered out of sequence in 1946 due to an administrative error. Into Darlington Works for cutting up 24/6/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 06/1921
MID Middlesbrough on 24/06/1936
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 04/06/1950
51D Middlesbrough on 19/11/1950
51C West Hartlepool on 08/09/1957
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 24/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 24/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1921 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1199)
23/06/1933 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 1D/689)
24/06/1936 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 113)
27/10/1938 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2467)
14/04/1942 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2465)
25/01/1945 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1219)
27/09/1947 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2662)
01/08/1950 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2466)
02/04/1955 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24747)
15/02/1958 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24732)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 09/11/1922 16/01/1923 69 days General  
Gateshead Works 26/04/1924 23/06/1924 59 days General  
Gateshead Works 29/09/1925 04/12/1925 67 days General  
Gateshead Works 18/08/1926 20/08/1926 3 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 24/08/1927 10/11/1927 79 days General  
Darlington Works 29/01/1929 05/04/1929 67 days General
Special bogie fitted
 
Gateshead Works 24/07/1930 28/07/1930 5 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 01/12/1930 23/01/1931 54 days General  
Darlington Works 15/05/1933 23/06/1933 40 days General
Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1936 24/06/1936 94 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 02/07/1936 15/07/1936 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/07/1936 03/08/1936 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/08/1936 13/10/1936 49 days Light Repair
Afer collision
 
Darlington Works 15/12/1936 07/01/1937 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/07/1937 19/08/1937 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/09/1938 27/10/1938 44 days General
Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 06/03/1942 14/04/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 06/12/1944 25/01/1945 51 days General
Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 22/08/1947 27/09/1947 37 days General
Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1949 12/01/1950 49 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 69878
 
Darlington Works 16/06/1950 01/08/1950 47 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1952 12/04/1952 25 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 15/04/1952 21/04/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/07/1952 15/07/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/03/1955 02/04/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 12/04/1955 18/04/1955 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/01/1957 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 14/01/1958 15/02/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 17/02/1958 19/02/1958 3 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service      
09/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1922. Dep: 16/01/1923.    
26/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 23/06/1924.    
29/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1925. Dep: 04/12/1925.    
18/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1926. Dep: 20/08/1926.    
24/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1927. Dep: 10/11/1927.    
29/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1929. Dep: 05/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Special bogie fitted
   
24/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1930. Dep: 28/07/1930.    
01/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1930. Dep: 23/01/1931.    
15/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1933. Dep: 23/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A)
   
23/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 23/03/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A)
   
24/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
02/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1936. Dep: 15/07/1936.    
27/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1936. Dep: 03/08/1936.    
26/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1936. Dep: 13/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Afer collision
   
15/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1936. Dep: 07/01/1937.    
30/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1937. Dep: 19/08/1937.    
14/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1938. Dep: 27/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A)
   
06/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1942. Dep: 14/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A)
   
06/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 25/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63)
   
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9878    
22/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A)
   
25/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1949. Dep: 12/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69878
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
16/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1950. Dep: 01/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 2466 (Diagram 63A)
   
19/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
19/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952.    
15/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 21/04/1952.    
09/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1952. Dep: 15/07/1952.    
02/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B)
   
12/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 18/04/1955.    
10/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/01/1957.    
08/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
14/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B)
   
17/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 19/02/1958.    
24/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69878 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev