|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 31/10/1923 | 21/01/1924 | 83 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1925 | 08/03/1926 | 110 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1927 | 24/11/1927 | 93 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1928 | 28/12/1928 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1929 | 10/09/1929 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1929 | 24/12/1929 | 55 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1931 | 26/01/1932 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1934 | 19/02/1934 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D1064 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1935 | 13/02/1936 | 81 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1940 | 31/05/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1944 | 25/05/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 109 days | General | Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69882 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1948 | 13/10/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1948 | 29/10/1948 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1950 | 20/06/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 32 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24702 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1953 | 18/07/1953 | 178 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1955 | 22/04/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24706 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1503 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
31/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1923. Dep: 21/01/1924. | ||
19/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1925. Dep: 08/03/1926. | ||
24/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927. | ||
26/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1928. Dep: 28/12/1928. | ||
20/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1929. Dep: 10/09/1929. | ||
31/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1929. Dep: 24/12/1929. | ||
30/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1931. Dep: 26/01/1932. | ||
16/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1934. Dep: 19/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1064 (Diagram 63) |
||
09/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
25/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 25/11/1935. Dep: 13/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
29/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/06/1936. | ||
02/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. | ||
29/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/07/1938. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
30/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/05/1939. | ||
15/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/08/1939. | ||
30/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1940. Dep: 31/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
28/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
07/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. | ||
27/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1944. Dep: 25/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9882 | ||
15/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69882 |
||
04/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948. | ||
21/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1948. Dep: 29/10/1948. | ||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
25/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950. | ||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 20/06/1950. | ||
01/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24702 (Diagram 63A) |
||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953. | ||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
06/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
07/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. | ||
16/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1955. Dep: 22/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24706 (Diagram 63B) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
14/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
19/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69882 from Thornaby (51L) |