|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/08/1923 | 27/10/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1925 | 20/08/1925 | 149 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1928 | 26/10/1928 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1929 | 25/02/1929 | 55 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1929 | 31/10/1929 | 45 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1930 | 15/10/1930 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1930 | 10/11/1930 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1931 | 01/06/1931 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1932 | 14/06/1933 | 188 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1933 | 01/08/1933 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1935 | 10/05/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1936 | 18/09/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1936 | 06/10/1936 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1936 | 20/10/1936 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1938 | 17/08/1938 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1938 | 07/09/1938 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1938 | 21/09/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1938 | 07/10/1938 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1940 | 31/10/1940 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1942 | 14/12/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1943 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1944 | 14/07/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1946 | 25/02/1946 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/04/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1948 | 16/07/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3901 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69884 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1949 | 16/03/1949 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/09/1949 | 11/01/1950 | 108 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1950 | 02/11/1950 | 31 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24685 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1951 | 21/05/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1952 | 24/01/1952 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24682 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1952 | 27/08/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1954 | 28/10/1954 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24766 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1525 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923. | ||
25/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1925. Dep: 20/08/1925. | ||
15/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. | ||
24/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1928. Dep: 26/10/1928. | ||
02/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/01/1929. Dep: 25/02/1929. | ||
17/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 31/10/1929. | ||
08/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1930. Dep: 15/10/1930. | ||
28/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1930. Dep: 10/11/1930. | ||
06/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1931. Dep: 01/06/1931. | ||
09/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 09/12/1932. Dep: 14/06/1933. | ||
20/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1933. Dep: 01/08/1933. | ||
29/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1935. Dep: 10/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
06/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1936. Dep: 18/09/1936. | ||
22/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1936. Dep: 06/10/1936. | ||
07/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1936. Dep: 20/10/1936. | ||
23/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1938. Dep: 17/08/1938. | ||
19/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 07/09/1938. | ||
12/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1938. Dep: 21/09/1938. | ||
30/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 07/10/1938. | ||
22/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middleton in Teesdale (Dar) | ||
20/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
23/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1940. Dep: 31/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
11/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 14/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
31/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/08/1943. | ||
16/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1944. Dep: 14/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
03/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/09/1945. | ||
09/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 25/02/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9884 | ||
21/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
08/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3901 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69884 |
||
05/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. | ||
28/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/02/1949. Dep: 16/03/1949. | ||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 11/01/1950. | ||
03/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1950. Dep: 02/11/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24685 (Diagram 63B) |
||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 21/05/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
18/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1952. Dep: 24/01/1952. | ||
07/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24682 (Diagram 63A) |
||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 27/08/1952. | ||
07/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
01/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954. | ||
04/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24766 (Diagram 63B) |
||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69884 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |