|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/05/1923 | 30/07/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1925 | 18/05/1925 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1927 | 17/06/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1928 | 09/08/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1929 | 30/09/1929 | 77 days | General | Boiler number D269 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1931 | 24/09/1931 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1933 | 25/08/1933 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1934 | 13/02/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1936 | 28/05/1936 | 88 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1939 | 25/09/1939 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1942 | 30/06/1942 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1943 | 13/03/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1944 | 22/12/1944 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 179 days | General | Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/12/1946 | 19/12/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9886 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2821 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1948 | 08/01/1948 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1949 | 24/01/1950 | 37 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69886 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1951 | 17/09/1951 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1954 | 14/05/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24726 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1957 | 27/04/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24708 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (York) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1527 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1923. Dep: 30/07/1923. | ||
21/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1925. Dep: 18/05/1925. | ||
29/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1927. Dep: 17/06/1927. | ||
21/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1928. Dep: 09/08/1928. | ||
16/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1929. Dep: 30/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D269 (Diagram 63) |
||
24/09/1930 | Modification | Diagram 63A number 4D/689 boiler fitted | ||
11/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1931. Dep: 24/09/1931. | ||
21/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1933. Dep: 25/08/1933. | ||
02/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1934. Dep: 13/02/1934. | ||
12/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 28/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
29/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
04/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1939. Dep: 25/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A) |
||
26/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
20/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 30/06/1942. | ||
04/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
16/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944. | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
06/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3069 (Diagram 63B) |
||
05/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
06/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1946. Dep: 19/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9886 |
||
14/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2821 (Diagram 63C) |
||
02/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1948. Dep: 08/01/1948. | ||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/10/1949. | ||
19/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1949. Dep: 24/01/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69886 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
17/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1951. Dep: 17/09/1951. | ||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 14/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24726 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
27/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24708 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
21/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69886 from Malton (50F) | ||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |