|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/09/1923 | 29/11/1923 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1925 | 14/10/1925 | 94 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1927 | 17/11/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1929 | 30/08/1929 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1930 | 30/09/1930 | 86 days | General | Boiler number D1310 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1933 | 10/01/1934 | 120 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1934 | 08/02/1934 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1935 | 29/11/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1938 | 29/04/1938 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1938 | 11/05/1938 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1939 | 19/09/1939 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1940 | 17/05/1940 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1941 | 01/08/1941 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1943 | 24/12/1943 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1944 | 31/01/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1944 | 27/09/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9887 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69887 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 38 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24752 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1953 | 10/02/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24739 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1955 | 27/10/1955 | 58 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Darlington) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1327 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1923. Dep: 29/11/1923. | ||
13/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1925. Dep: 14/10/1925. | ||
25/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1927. Dep: 17/11/1927. | ||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
16/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
12/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 30/08/1929. | ||
26/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
07/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1930. Dep: 30/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1310 (Diagram 63) |
||
13/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 13/09/1933. Dep: 10/01/1934. | ||
19/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1934. Dep: 08/02/1934. | ||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
29/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/08/1935. | ||
16/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1935. Dep: 29/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/12/1936. | ||
25/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1938. Dep: 29/04/1938. | ||
30/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1938. Dep: 11/05/1938. | ||
30/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
14/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1939. Dep: 19/09/1939. | ||
16/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940. | ||
02/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1941. Dep: 01/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 113 (Diagram 63A) |
||
31/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
02/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1943. Dep: 24/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) |
||
05/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1944. Dep: 31/01/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
07/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 27/09/1944. | ||
21/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9887 |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
15/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
07/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69887 |
||
15/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. | ||
14/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24752 (Diagram 63B) |
||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 10/02/1953. | ||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24739 (Diagram 63B) |
||
23/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. | ||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 27/10/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
16/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69887 from Darlington (51A) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |