Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 165 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 165 Week
» 39211 Month
» 413224 Year
» 1634789 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1330 m/e 12/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9889   19/05/1946
British Railways 69889   24/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H112/1921
A826/05/1934
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1921 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Mon 30/05/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 38 yrs , 6 mths

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 30/5/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) m/e 12/1921
MID Middlesbrough on 24/05/1934
SKN Stockton on 29/05/1934
SALT Saltburn on 11/09/1942
51D Middlesbrough on 19/09/1954
54A Sunderland on 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn on 30/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 30/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1921 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1287)
26/05/1934 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2453)
27/12/1935 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1310)
30/06/1939 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3040)
03/09/1942 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3059)
27/07/1944 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3066)
24/12/1948 Diagram 63C boiler fitted (number 2822)
09/12/1950 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 24690)
10/07/1952 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24736)
26/06/1954 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24719)
18/05/1957 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24757)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 23/02/1923 03/05/1923 70 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/03/1924 28/04/1924 57 days General  
Gateshead Works 25/11/1925 02/03/1926 98 days General  
Gateshead Works 18/03/1927 28/03/1927 11 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 04/01/1928 21/03/1928 78 days General  
Gateshead Works 07/10/1929 21/10/1929 15 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 26/02/1930 14/04/1930 48 days General  
Gateshead Works 22/02/1932 01/04/1932 40 days General  
Darlington Works 12/03/1934 26/05/1934 76 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 30/10/1935 27/12/1935 59 days General
Boiler number D1310 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 19/12/1938 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 17/04/1939 30/06/1939 75 days General
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 07/10/1940 24/10/1940 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/07/1942 03/09/1942 41 days General
Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1944 27/07/1944 38 days General
Boiler number 3066 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 31/10/1944 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/03/1945 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 04/09/1945 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 11/01/1946 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 17/05/1946 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 14/06/1946 04/10/1946 113 days General  
Darlington Works 18/11/1948 24/12/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C)
Renumbered to BR 69889
 
Darlington Works 06/11/1950 09/12/1950 34 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1952 10/07/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 05/02/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 27/05/1954 26/06/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 18/04/1957 18/05/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 24757 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1957 21/05/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/06/1957 06/06/1957 4 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service      
24/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
29/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
11/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9889    
19/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
30/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69889 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev