|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/02/1923 | 03/05/1923 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/03/1924 | 28/04/1924 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1925 | 02/03/1926 | 98 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/03/1927 | 28/03/1927 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/01/1928 | 21/03/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1929 | 21/10/1929 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/02/1930 | 14/04/1930 | 48 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/02/1932 | 01/04/1932 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 76 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1935 | 27/12/1935 | 59 days | General | Boiler number D1310 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1939 | 30/06/1939 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1940 | 24/10/1940 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1942 | 03/09/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1944 | 27/07/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3066 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1944 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1946 | 04/10/1946 | 113 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69889 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 34 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1952 | 10/07/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24757 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 21/05/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1957 | 06/06/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1330 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1923. Dep: 03/05/1923. | ||
03/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1924. Dep: 28/04/1924. | ||
25/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1925. Dep: 02/03/1926. | ||
18/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1927. Dep: 28/03/1927. | ||
04/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1928. Dep: 21/03/1928. | ||
07/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1929. Dep: 21/10/1929. | ||
26/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1930. Dep: 14/04/1930. | ||
22/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1932. Dep: 01/04/1932. | ||
12/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 12/03/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
24/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
29/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
30/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1935. Dep: 27/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1310 (Diagram 63) |
||
19/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/12/1938. | ||
17/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 30/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B) |
||
07/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1940. Dep: 24/10/1940. | ||
25/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 03/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
20/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1944. Dep: 27/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3066 (Diagram 63B) |
||
31/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/10/1944. | ||
09/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/03/1945. | ||
04/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/09/1945. | ||
11/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/01/1946. | ||
17/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/05/1946. | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9889 | ||
14/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1946. Dep: 04/10/1946. | ||
18/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69889 |
||
06/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24690 (Diagram 63A) |
||
13/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1952. Dep: 10/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24736 (Diagram 63B) |
||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/02/1953. | ||
27/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24719 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
18/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24757 (Diagram 63B) |
||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 21/05/1957. | ||
03/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 06/06/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
30/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69889 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |