|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/02/1925 | 03/04/1925 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/05/1927 | 02/08/1927 | 75 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1929 | 26/07/1929 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1931 | 11/08/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1019 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/09/1933 | 27/10/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1935 | 09/10/1935 | 94 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1939 | 29/11/1939 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1940 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1940 | 24/12/1940 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1941 | 27/08/1941 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1944 | 04/04/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1945 | 10/11/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 30 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/12/1946 | 13/12/1946 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1947 | 16/01/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 30 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3981 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69890 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 07/06/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24684 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1958 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1521 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1925. Dep: 03/04/1925. | ||
20/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1927. Dep: 02/08/1927. | ||
17/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1929. Dep: 26/07/1929. | ||
29/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1931. Dep: 11/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1019 (Diagram 63) |
||
19/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1933. Dep: 27/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
08/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 08/07/1935. Dep: 09/10/1935. | ||
05/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
16/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
30/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1939. Dep: 29/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1208 (Diagram 63) |
||
01/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
02/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/08/1940. | ||
26/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1940. Dep: 24/12/1940. | ||
04/01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
08/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1941. Dep: 27/08/1941. | ||
06/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2377 (Diagram 63) |
||
14/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 04/04/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
21/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9890 | ||
01/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1946. Dep: 13/12/1946. | ||
13/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 16/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
15/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
05/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3981 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69890 |
||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 07/06/1950. | ||
26/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24684 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/03/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
30/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
11/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/01/1958. | ||
13/01/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69890 from Malton (50F) | ||
03/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |