|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/11/1923 | 11/02/1924 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1924 | 10/02/1925 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1925 | 05/11/1925 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1926 | 30/06/1926 | 122 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1926 | 22/02/1927 | 110 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1927 | 15/09/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1928 | 25/04/1928 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1929 | 10/05/1929 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1929 | 03/01/1930 | 57 days | General | Boiler number D1278 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1931 | 18/12/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1934 | 04/03/1935 | 89 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1939 | 11/05/1939 | 87 days | General | Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1939 | 15/06/1939 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1944 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/10/1947 | 19/11/1947 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1948 | 09/02/1949 | 41 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69892 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1949 | 16/03/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1949 | 05/01/1950 | 37 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1950 | 08/11/1950 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24688 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24741 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24720 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
30/04/1949 | Newcastle Station | Locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 60871, 62719 an 69892. | SLS/194905 |
31/10/1957 | Saltburn MPD | Owing to institution of diesel services only five locos. are allocated here viz. A8's 69866/9/80/92/4. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1326 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 11/02/1924. | ||
15/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1924. Dep: 10/02/1925. | ||
28/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1925. Dep: 05/11/1925. | ||
01/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1926. Dep: 30/06/1926. | ||
05/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1926. Dep: 22/02/1927. | ||
06/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1927. Dep: 15/09/1927. | ||
17/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1928. Dep: 25/04/1928. | ||
09/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1929. Dep: 10/05/1929. | ||
08/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1929. Dep: 03/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1278 (Diagram 63) |
||
03/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1931. Dep: 18/12/1931. | ||
06/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/12/1934. Dep: 04/03/1935. | ||
12/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
14/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1939. Dep: 11/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
05/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1939. Dep: 15/06/1939. | ||
09/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
28/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
29/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
14/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/08/1944. | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9892 | ||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
15/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
22/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 19/11/1947. | ||
31/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 09/02/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69892 |
||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 16/03/1949. | ||
30/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950. | ||
06/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/03/1950. | ||
11/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 08/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24688 (Diagram 63A) |
||
14/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/03/1952. | ||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24741 (Diagram 63C) |
||
20/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24720 (Diagram 63B) |
||
09/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. | ||
29/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69892 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
24/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. |