Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 463 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 463 Week
» 17799 Month
» 295595 Year
» 1179976 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
MET 108 m/e 04/1921
LNER (1943) 6420   25/03/1938
LNER (1946) 7515   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Class H2
Company History MET/LNER/BR
Wheels 4-4-4T
Builder Kerr Stuart
Works Number 4093
To Service During 04/1921 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Thu 03/01/1946 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) m/e 04/1921
LNG Langwith Junction 12/12/1941
CLK Colwick 14/08/1942
   Withdrawn 03/01/1946

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1943 Diagram 12A boiler fitted (number 1422)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Neasden 1935 09/1935   General  
Stratford Works 07/1938 25/03/1938   General  
Stratford Works 07/07/1943 1 day General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as MET Number 108
Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4093
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 12A boiler fitted
   
1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/09/1935.    
25/03/1938 Renumbered Renumbered to 6420    
07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/07/1938. Dep: 25/03/1938.    
12/12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/1943 Modification Diagram 12A number 1422 boiler fitted    
07/1943 Modification Diagram 12A number LT16 boiler fitted    
07/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1943.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 7515 but not taken up    
03/01/1946 Withdrawn Condemned as 6420 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev