Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Metropolitan Railway |
109 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) |
6421 |
|
24/03/1938 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Stratford |
|
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Neasden |
|
1936 |
01/1936 |
|
General |
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
1938 |
24/03/1938 |
|
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1943) number 6421
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Metropolitan Railway Number 109 Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4094 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 12A boiler fitted |
|
|
1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Neasden (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: ?/01/1936. |
|
|
1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 24/03/1938. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1943) number 6421
|
|
|
06/12/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
12/12/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
15/04/1942 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6421 from Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|