Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 312 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3774 Week
» 23507 Month
» 320521 Year
» 397108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D601 28/03/1958

Names Carried
Name Date From
ARK ROYAL 28/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D20/2
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L76
Works Number 27661
To Service 28/03/1958
Withdrawn 31/12/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Total Mileage 587,000 miles
Cut Up 01/06/1980
Cut At Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 28/03/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 14/06/1958
84A Laira 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 31/12/1967


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 18/03/1958 24/03/1958 7 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 15/04/1958 22/04/1958 8 days Adjustment  
Swindon Works 15/05/1958 02/06/1958 19 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 05/10/1959 07/12/1959 64 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 10/03/1960 04/05/1960 56 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 24/08/1960 30/09/1960 38 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 18/11/1960 05/01/1961 49 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 22/03/1961 15/05/1961 55 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 14/09/1961 27/09/1961 14 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 05/12/1961 21/12/1961 17 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 01/08/1962 03/08/1962 3 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 19/09/1962 06/10/1962 18 days Heavy Casual  
Swindon Works 26/09/1963 25/10/1963 30 days Heavy Casual  
Swindon Works 23/01/1964 01/02/1964 10 days Unknown Regime  
Swindon Works 09/03/1964 26/03/1964 18 days Adjustment  
Swindon Works 05/12/1965   Unknown Regime  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1958 To Service To service as D601, name: ARK ROYAL
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27661
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
31/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D601    
01/06/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Woodham Brothers: Barry, South Glamorgan    

prev prev