Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1133   05/1899
LNER (1924) 4133   02/1926
LNER (1946) 4129   11/1946
BR 64129   09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt / N. Gresley
Class J3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J405/1899
J308/1916
Wheels 0-6-0
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/09/1952
Service Life 53 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys
Information 315 Series

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn w/e 01/09/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 24/11/1946
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/08/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 24/08/1947
WDN   w/e 01/09/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev