Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 186 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 186 Week
» 6320 Month
» 234204 Year
» 1455769 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 25 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 3025 m/e 02/1926
LNER (1946) 5484 m/e 12/1946
BR 65484 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class J5
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J506/1910
Wheels 0-6-0
Order Number 262
Works Number 1270
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Mon 09/03/1953
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1910
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 09/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 30/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
WDN 38A Colwick 09/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/07/1949 Derby Friargate MPD On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. SLS/194909
09/03/1953 First withdrawals Among the engines withdrawn on 9th March were two representatives of Classes hitherto intact. No. 62651, one of the original G.C. 'Directors' of Class '11E' (L.N.E. Class 'D10') was built at Gorton in October, 1913, as No. 430 Purdon Viccars and was a regular visitor to Neasden. It was renumbered 2651 in October, 1946, and 62651 in August, 1948. It was withdrawn from Northwich L.M.R. (9G). There were only ten engines in this Class. No. 65484 was built at Doncaster in 1910 (works No. 1270) as G.N.R. No. 25 Class 'J22' (L.N.E. Class 'J5') and when new went to New England, painted in the standard lined green of that period. It was renumbered from 3025 to 5484 in November, 1946, and 65484 in April, 1949. It was withdrawn from Colwick (38A) where all the Class is stationed, though one is usually subshedded at Leicester (38C). SLS/195306

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 25    
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 3025    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5484    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65484    
09/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 65484    

prev prev