Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 785 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18588 Week
» 71604 Month
» 191131 Year
» 3217984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
29 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3029 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5488 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65488 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J5 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
262 |
Works Number |
1274 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 19/10/1953 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1910 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/10/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed 2MT 78010 an 78011 is ready for trials. Diesel shunters are out up to 13074, with the next four nearly completed. J2 65023 (fully lined out) and J5 65488, both from 38A, arrived here on 3rd December for cutting up. J77 68281 has also been cut up. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 29 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3029 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5488 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65488 |
|
|
19/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65488 |
|
|