Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 485 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19396 Week
» 84350 Month
» 287014 Year
» 3313867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
523 |
m/e |
09/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3523 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4172 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64172 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
266 |
Works Number |
1313 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/05/1958 |
Spalding MPD |
Spalding, ex M. & G.N. shed is no longer supplied by New England but by Boston. On 11th May the following were on shed-D2234, 43059/ 61/2/4/5/80/3/5, 61756, 64171/2/91, 64231 /78 an 68560 all of Boston (40F). |
SLS/195806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 523 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1313 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3523 |
|
|
08/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4172 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64172 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64172 |
|
|