Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3022 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16428 Week
» 69444 Month
» 188971 Year
» 3215824 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
539 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3539 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4188 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64188 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
271 |
Works Number |
1365 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/10/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1943 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 539 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1365 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3539 |
|
|
05/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4188 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64188 |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64188 |
|
|