Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2827 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16233 Week
» 69249 Month
» 188776 Year
» 3215629 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
546 |
m/e |
05/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3546 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4195 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64195 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1381 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 29/01/1958 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1913 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1941 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 546 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1381 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3546 |
|
|
04/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4195 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64195 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
29/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64195 |
|
|
03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|