Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 680 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18483 Week
» 71499 Month
» 191026 Year
» 3217879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
554 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3554 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4203 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64203 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1389 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/06/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 554 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1389 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3554 |
|
|
12/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4203 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64203 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64203 |
|
|