Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 575 m/e 10/1913
LNER (1924) 3575 m/e 11/1924
LNER (1946) 4224 m/e 11/1946
BR 64224 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt / N. Gresley
Class J6
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 275
Works Number 1410
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 10/1913
Withdrawal Thu 14/05/1959
Scrapping During 06/1959
Service Life 45 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35A New England 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 14/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 11/06/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   14/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1943 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1913 To Service To service as GNR Number 575
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1410
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 3575    
03/1943 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4224    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64224    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
14/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64224    

prev prev