Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 479 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19390 Week
» 84344 Month
» 287008 Year
» 3313861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
576 |
m/e |
07/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3576 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4225 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64225 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
278 |
Works Number |
1436 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/07/1958 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
w/e |
04/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 576 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1436 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3576 |
|
|
12/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4225 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64225 |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
07/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64225 |
|
|