Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2859 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16265 Week
» 69281 Month
» 188808 Year
» 3215661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
607 |
m/e |
04/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3607 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4256 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64256 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
285 |
Works Number |
1488 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/04/1960 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/03/1959 |
Higham Ferrers branch |
On 2nd and 3rd March J6 64256 (15E) worked the Higham Ferrers branch goods but on 4th March it was put into store at Wellingboro-the passenger service was being worked by 84007. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 607 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1488 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3607 |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4256 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64256 |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) |
|
|
02/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
29/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64256 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|