Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1645 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19448 Week
» 72464 Month
» 191991 Year
» 3218844 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
629 |
m/e |
05/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3629 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4268 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
64268 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
287 |
Works Number |
1511 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 18/01/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. |
SLS/194903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 629 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1511 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3629 |
|
|
04/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4268 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64268 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) |
|
|
18/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64268 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|