Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1071 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18874 Week
» 71890 Month
» 191417 Year
» 3218270 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
787 |
|
03/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5787 |
|
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5131 |
|
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65131 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3705 |
To Service |
During 03/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/03/1959 |
Service Life |
63 yrs , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1955 |
Northwich MPD |
Once quite a 'J10 stronghold', this shed, in January, 1955, has only four examples on its strength: 65131, 65134, 65165 an 65169. Their duties are confined to shunting and trips on the Winsford branch. Three 'super Ds' now deal with the Winnington branch traffic and the last ex-GC 2-6-4 tank has gone. It was a much-photographed locomotive, the running shed foreman relating how, what he rather delightfully styled a 'number snatcher', had come all the way from Scotland to secure a picture! There has been a resurgence of Sunday 'hoppers' between Northwich and Tunstead, no less than five trips being run on 9/1/55. The two diesel shunters allocated to Northwich last year continue to give satisfaction. They run down to Crewe once per fortnight for re-fuelling and servicing. A somewhat rare visitor to Northwich when on 8/1/55 was 2-6-4T 42566 of 5A. The only other ex-L.N.E. locomotive present on 8/1/55 was D10 4-4-0 62656 'Sir. Clement Royds'. |
SLS/195503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 787 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3705 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5787 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5131 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65131 |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65131 |
|
|