Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 546 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18349 Week
» 71365 Month
» 190892 Year
» 3217745 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
793 |
|
04/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5793 |
|
05/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5135 |
|
01/1946 |
British Railways |
65135 |
|
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3711 |
To Service |
During 04/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/04/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1896 |
10F |
|
Lower Ince |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
9F |
|
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
10F |
Lower Ince |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
10F |
Lower Ince |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 793 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3711 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5793 |
|
|
01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5135 |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65135 |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65135 |
|
|