Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1412 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19215 Week
» 72231 Month
» 191758 Year
» 3218611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
812 |
|
10/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5812 |
|
10/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5148 |
|
01/1946 |
British Railways |
65148 |
|
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3730 |
To Service |
During 10/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/12/1956 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 812 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3730 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5812 |
|
|
01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5148 |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65148 |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
10/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65148 |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|