Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4784 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 83781 Month
» 286445 Year
» 3313298 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
819 |
|
11/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5819 |
|
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5151 |
|
01/1946 |
British Railways |
65151 |
|
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3737 |
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/03/1952 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10F |
Lower Ince |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 819 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3737 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5819 |
|
|
01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5151 |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65151 |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F) |
|
|
24/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65151 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|