Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1887 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15930 Week
» 80884 Month
» 283548 Year
» 3310401 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
827 |
|
01/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5827 |
|
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5156 |
|
02/1946 |
British Railways |
65156 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3745 |
To Service |
During 01/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/02/1958 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/09/1953 |
Northwich MPD |
The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. |
SLS/195311 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 827 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3745 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5827 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (CHR) |
|
|
02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5156 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65156 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
15/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65156 |
|
|