Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15981 Week
» 68997 Month
» 188524 Year
» 3215377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
978 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5978 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4285 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64285 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6040 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/08/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1943 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 978 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6040 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5978 |
|
|
03/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4285 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64285 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
04/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64285 |
|
|