Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 116 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1402 Week
» 28876 Month
» 325890 Year
» 402477 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 979   09/1901
LNER (1924) 5979   03/1925
LNER (1946) 4286   08/1946
BR 64286   11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/109/1901
J11/405/1936
J11/511/1938
Wheels 0-6-0
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6041
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal Mon 10/10/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 10/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1936 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64286    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tuxford (TUX)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
10/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 64286    

prev prev