Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 117 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1403 Week
» 28877 Month
» 325891 Year
» 402478 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 985   12/1901
LNER (1924) 5985   11/1924
LNER (1946) 4292   09/1946
BR 64292   08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/112/1901
J11/410/1931
J11/505/1937
Wheels 0-6-0
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6047
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Fri 20/07/1962
Service Life 60 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/08/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn 20/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1916 Superheated boiler fitted
03/1922 Saturated boiler fitted
10/1931 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64292    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64292    

prev prev