Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 480 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19391 Week
» 84345 Month
» 287009 Year
» 3313862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
989 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5989 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4296 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
64296 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6051 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/07/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MEX |
Mexborough |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1941 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 989 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6051 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5989 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
04/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4296 |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64296 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
07/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64296 |
|
|