Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3788 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13362 Week
» 78316 Month
» 280980 Year
» 3307833 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
999 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5999 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4306 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64306 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6061 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 23/08/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1902 |
39A |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 999 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6061 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5999 |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4306 |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64306 |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
23/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64306 |
|
|