Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 927 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14333 Week
» 67349 Month
» 186876 Year
» 3213729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1003 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6003 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4310 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64310 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
6065 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/03/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Langwith Junction |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1915 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1923 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
07/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1003 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6065 |
|
|
08/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6003 |
|
|
07/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4310 |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64310 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64310 |
|
|