Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1007 m/e 04/1902
LNER (1924) 6007 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 4314 m/e 09/1946
BR 64314 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/104/1902
J11/406/1938
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6069
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 60 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64314    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64314    

prev prev