Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1010 m/e 05/1902
LNER (1924) 6010 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 4317 m/e 09/1946
BR 64317 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/105/1902
J11/404/1933
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6072
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal Wed 15/03/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 05/01/1947
38B Annesley 4w/e 20/08/1955
38A Colwick 3w/e 12/11/1955
39A Gorton 5w/e 17/12/1955
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn 15/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1916 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64317    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
15/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64317    

prev prev