Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 48 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3191 Week
» 13361 Month
» 291157 Year
» 1175538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1012 m/e 05/1902
LNER (1924) 6012 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 4319 m/e 09/1946
BR 64319 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/105/1902
J11/412/1929
J11/505/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6074
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal Mon 17/08/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster 5w/e 23/08/1952
36C Frodingham 4w/e 13/11/1954
   Withdrawn 17/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1916 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64319    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mexborough (MEX)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
17/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64319    

prev prev