Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 91 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7551 Week
» 5064 Month
» 232948 Year
» 1454513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1047 m/e 10/1902
LNER (1924) 6047 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1946) 4324 m/e 12/1946
BR 64324 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/210/1902
J11/404/1934
J11/303/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6230
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
38B Annesley 4w/e 20/08/1955
39A Gorton 4w/e 09/11/1957
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/02/1958
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 04/02/1961
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1925 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1047
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6230
   
12/1925 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6047    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4324    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64324    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64324    

prev prev