Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 646 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14052 Week
» 67068 Month
» 186595 Year
» 3213448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
214 |
m/e |
11/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5214 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4337 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64337 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4529 |
To Service |
During 11/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1961 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
TUX |
Tuxford |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1928 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 214 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4529 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5214 |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4337 |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64337 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64337 |
|
|