Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 386 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18189 Week
» 71205 Month
» 190732 Year
» 3217585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
234 |
m/e |
04/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5234 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4353 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
64353 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4557 |
To Service |
During 04/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1904 |
39A |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/02/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39A |
Gorton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1926 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 234 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4557 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5234 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4353 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64353 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64353 |
|
|