Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
208 |
m/e |
02/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5208 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4359 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
64359 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 02/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/04/1961 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1904 |
38B |
|
Annesley |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
9G |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/04/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
LOAN |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
23/02/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
5w/e |
02/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 208 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5208 |
|
|
06/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4359 |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64359 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
25/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64359 |
|
|