Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 2361 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15767 Week
» 68783 Month
» 188310 Year
» 3215163 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
246 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5246 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4375 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64375 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1936 |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1914 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/1921 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
04/1927 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 246 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1936 |
|
|
12/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5246 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4375 |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64375 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64375 |
|
|