Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 247 m/e 07/1904
LNER (1924) 5247 m/e 06/1925
LNER (1946) 4376 m/e 05/1946
BR 64376 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/207/1904
J11/402/1932
J11/504/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1937
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal Mon 09/11/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/10/1952
36D Barnsley 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 09/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64376    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
09/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64376    

prev prev