Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2173 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19976 Week
» 72992 Month
» 192519 Year
» 3219372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
247 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5247 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4376 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64376 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1937 |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/11/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1921 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 247 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1937 |
|
|
05/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5247 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4376 |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64376 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
09/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64376 |
|
|