Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1920 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15326 Week
» 68342 Month
» 187869 Year
» 3214722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1078 |
m/e |
08/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6078 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4386 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
64386 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
820 |
To Service |
During 08/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1905 |
38B |
|
Annesley |
4w/e |
20/08/1955 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1930 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1078 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 820 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6078 |
|
|
08/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4386 |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64386 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64386 |
|
|