Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 414 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7421 Week
» 13555 Month
» 241439 Year
» 1463004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1116 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6116 m/e 05/1924
LNER (1946) 4392 m/e 10/1946
BR 64392 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/206/1906
J11/105/1924
J11/407/1941
J11/501/1946
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 855
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Tue 02/12/1958
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
38A Colwick 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn 02/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TUX Tuxford 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 22/02/1958
WDN   02/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1116
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 855
   
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6116    
07/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4392    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64392    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
02/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64392    

prev prev