Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 712 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14118 Week
» 67134 Month
» 186661 Year
» 3213514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1116 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6116 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4392 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64392 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
855 |
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/12/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1906 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TUX |
Tuxford |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1941 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1116 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 855 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6116 |
|
|
07/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4392 |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64392 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
02/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64392 |
|
|