Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1118 m/e 08/1906
LNER (1924) 6118 m/e 10/1926
LNER (1946) 4394 m/e 10/1946
BR 64394 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/208/1906
J11/409/1934
J11/502/1948
J11/303/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 857
To Service During 08/1906
Withdrawal Fri 24/08/1962
Service Life 56 yrs , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 24/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1934 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64394    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA)    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
24/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64394    

prev prev