Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
290 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5290 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4405 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64405 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 03/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 23/04/1960 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1907 |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
40D |
|
Tuxford |
5w/e |
24/03/1956 |
39A |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
40D |
Tuxford |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
40D |
Tuxford |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
LOAN |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
9H |
Gorton |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1935 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 290 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5290 |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4405 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64405 |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64405 |
|
|